ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS NORTHUMBERLAND WEST BRANCH

Charity number: 232241
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 23 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 23 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 25 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 30 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 18 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 18 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 04 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 04 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 17 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 01 July 2016 On time Download