ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS NORTHUMBERLAND WEST BRANCH

Charity number: 232241
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £272.73k £281.02k £286.54k £294.68k £287.94k
Total expenditure £251.55k £284.40k £273.94k £297.04k £295.33k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A