Financial history RHODES TRUST - PUBLIC PURPOSES FUND

Charity number: 232492
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £15.13m £22.09m £29.08m £92.46m £23.02m
Total expenditure £20.56m £18.13m £24.18m £28.84m £28.97m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £23.38m £22.37m £15.15m £96.66m £12.73m
Income - Other trading activities £510.09k £520.80k £541.99k £292.18k £0
Income - Charitable activities £606.73k £1.36m £5.20m £6.35m £6.30m
Income - Endowments £20.57m £14.30m £2.95m £25.22m £11.26m
Income - Investment £8.33m £9.51m £11.01m £14.20m £15.25m
Income - Other £125.77k £0 £125.48k £184.17k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £27.06k £0 £101.15k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £17.65m £15.56m £21.25m £25.14m £25.47m
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.91m £2.57m £2.94m £3.70m £3.50m
Expenditure - Governance £0 £116.14k £146.29k £62.92k £72.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £60.72k £0
Expenditure - Investment management £919.39k £1.05m £1.08m £1.25m £1.69m
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0