RHODES TRUST - PUBLIC PURPOSES FUND

Charity number: 232492
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

18 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Doug Beck Trustee 01 July 2020 None on record
Peter Stamos Trustee 31 October 2018 None on record
GLEN JAMES Trustee 30 October 2018 None on record
DAME HELEN GHOSH Trustee 30 October 2018
THE MASTER AND SCHOLARS OF BALLIOL COLLEGE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD Received: On time
THE MAURICE LUBBOCK MEMORIAL FUND Received: On time
ACTION FOR CONSERVATION Received: On time
THE TABLET TRUST Received: On time
PROFESSOR SIR JOHN BELL Trustee 30 October 2018
THE OXFORD HEALTH ALLIANCE VISION 2020 Received: On time
GOD'S HOUSE IN EWELME Received: On time
EWELME ELEMENTARY EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
Professor ELLEKE BOEHMER Trustee 30 October 2018
AURORA EDUCATION FOUNDATION (UK) Received: On time
Karen O'Brien Trustee 31 October 2018
CHAWTON HOUSE LIBRARY Received: On time
Professor Catherine O'Regan Trustee 31 October 2018
SA CONSTITUTIONAL COURT TRUST UK Received: On time
THE PRINCIPAL AND FELLOWS OF MANSFIELD COLLEGE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD Received: On time
DONALD GOGEL Trustee 30 October 2018 None on record
Andrew Banks Trustee 30 October 2018 None on record
Dapo Akande Trustee 01 July 2020
THE RECTOR AND SCHOLARS OF EXETER COLLEGE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD Received: On time
Chris Oechsli Trustee 18 June 2020 None on record
Swati Mylavarapu Trustee 06 March 2020 None on record
Michael Fitzpatrick Trustee 31 October 2018 None on record
Robert Sternfels Trustee 31 October 2018 None on record
Neeti Bhalla Johnson Trustee 06 March 2020 None on record
KAREN STEVENSON Trustee 30 October 2018 None on record
Dr Tariro Makadzange Trustee 30 October 2018 None on record