Financial history THE LONDON WELSH CENTRE TRUST

Charity number: 232672
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £521.15k £440.28k £440.28k £412.30k £328.52k
Total expenditure £341.26k £461.05k £461.05k £399.64k £362.67k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £115.55k
Income - Donations and legacies £163.16k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £298.18k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £59.65k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £156 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £114.31k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £97.92k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £243.34k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £35.26k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A