TIVERTON AGRICULTURAL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 232688
Charity reporting is overdue by 148 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2015 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019
Total gross income £7.13k £6.24k £6.30k £6.90k £6.80k
Total expenditure £6.24k £6.25k £6.35k £7.02k £6.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A