THE NAFFERTON FEOFFEES CHARITIES TRUST

Charity number: 232796
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £51.85k £48.61k £44.15k £31.99k £32.69k
Total expenditure £27.37k £51.74k £1.09m £35.95k £36.01k