THE NAFFERTON FEOFFEES CHARITIES TRUST

Charity number: 232796
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
IAN WILLIAM KITCHING Trustee 25 April 2013
CHARITY OF GEORGE HODGSON Charity reporting is up to date
ALICE JEFFERSON Charity reporting is up to date
HUGO GLOVER Trustee 20 April 2012 None on record
FIONA TREWARTHA Trustee None on record
BARRY MARK GREEN Trustee 01 January 2016 None on record
CAROLINE HARRISON Trustee 20 April 2012 None on record
Dr David Wigglesworth Chair
CHURCH REST HOUSES Charity reporting is 127 days late
NICHOLAS WAITES Trustee 01 July 2018 None on record
MARGARET ANN BUCKTON Trustee None on record
Paul Nicholson Trustee 08 July 2019 None on record