MRS MARY TURNER'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITY

Charity number: 233062
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £7.25k £7.29k £7.55k £8.09k £7.80k
Total expenditure £325 £2.16k £17.01k £4.37k £5.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A