THE BRITISH ACADEMY FOR THE PROMOTION OF HISTORICAL PHILOSOPHICAL AND PHILOLOGICAL STUDIES

Charity number: 233176
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

25 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Professor Bencie Woll Trustee 23 July 2020
THE SIERATZKI CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
Professor Chakravarthi Ram-Prasad Trustee 18 July 2019 None on record
Professor CHARLES TRIPP Trustee 19 July 2018
ALTAJIR TRUST Received: On time
Professor Dauvit Bron Trustee 23 July 2020 None on record
Professor Andrew Hurrell Trustee 23 July 2020
THE MASTER AND SCHOLARS OF BALLIOL COLLEGE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD Received: On time
Professor Rana Mitter Trustee 22 July 2021 None on record
Professor Ingrid De Smet Trustee 23 July 2020 None on record
Professor Ian Christie Trustee 22 July 2021
KINO KLASSIKA FOUNDATION Received: On time
Professor Sarah Birch Trustee 18 July 2019 None on record
Professor Sally Shuttleworth Trustee 14 July 2016 None on record
PROFESSOR ADITI LAHIRI Trustee 19 July 2018
UK ALEXANDER VON HUMBOLDT ASSOCIATION Received: On time
THE PRINCIPAL AND FELLOWS OF SOMERVILLE COLLEGE Received: On time
THE PHILOLOGICAL SOCIETY Received: On time
Professor Simon Swain Trustee 18 July 2019 None on record
Professor Jane Millar Trustee 18 July 2019
CHILD POVERTY ACTION GROUP Received: On time
Professor Tony Manstead Trustee 18 July 2019 None on record
PROFESSOR JULIA BLACK Chair 22 July 2021 None on record
Professor Christina Boswell Trustee 22 July 2021 None on record
Professor Angela McRobbie Trustee 22 July 2021 None on record
PROFESSOR CONOR GEARTY Trustee 23 July 2020
THE MODERN LAW REVIEW LIMITED Received: On time
Professor Hamish Scott FBA Trustee 19 July 2018 None on record
Professor Felix Driver Trustee 22 July 2021 None on record
Professor Marianne Elliott Trustee 22 July 2021 None on record
Professor Isobel Armstrong Trustee 23 July 2020 None on record
Professor Annett Volfing Trustee 19 July 2019 None on record
Professor Graeme Barker Trustee 22 July 2021 None on record
Professor Simon Goldhill Trustee 18 July 2019 None on record