THE BARKWAY NON-ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITIES

Charity number: 233343
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £4.30k £4.33k £4.45k £4.61k £5.50k
Total expenditure £2.67k £3.88k £3.70k £5.27k £4.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A