CRACKINGTON INSTITUTE

Charity number: 233549
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020
Total gross income £9.71k £11.45k £10.50k £10.63k £10.13k
Total expenditure £8.80k £11.35k £9.30k £9.46k £9.58k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A