Financial history ROBERT STEWART MEMORIAL UNITED REFORMED CHURCH

Charity number: 233569
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £34.54k £40.21k £64.50k £21.78k £25.42k
Total expenditure £31.94k £33.35k £30.26k £49.50k £24.95k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A