Financial history STONY STRATFORD AID IN SICKNESS FUND

Charity number: 233610
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £9.01k £937 £651 £505 £650
Total expenditure £10.24k £105 £1.22k £600 £500
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A