Accounts and annual returns WESTMINSTER ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESAN TRUST AND OTHER TRUST FUNDS ADMINISTERED BY THE WESTMINSTER ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESAN TRUSTEE

Charity number: 233699
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 19 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 20 July 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 31 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 31 July 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 18 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 18 October 2017 On time Download Open in new window