Financial history WESTMINSTER ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESAN TRUST AND OTHER TRUST FUNDS ADMINISTERED BY THE WESTMINSTER ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESAN TRUSTEE

Charity number: 233699
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £55.89m £54.63m £54.50m £50.08m £54.04m
Total expenditure £50.20m £47.33m £44.39m £44.36m £50.09m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £95.00k N/A £15.78m
Income - Donations and legacies £42.12m £39.76m £37.78m £32.36m £26.36m
Income - Other trading activities £754.00k £741.00k £702.00k £775.18k £163.00k
Income - Charitable activities £10.05m £10.41m £11.51m £12.16m £22.18m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.96m £3.71m £4.51m £4.79m £3.96m
Income - Other £1.00k £3.00k £1.00k £1.40k £1.38m
Income - Legacies £2.34m £1.92m £3.32m £1.89m £2.23m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £49.72m £46.87m £43.92m £43.90m £49.82m
Expenditure - Raising funds £485.00k £467.00k £472.00k £465.99k £268.00k
Expenditure - Governance £111.00k £62.00k £70.00k £65.51k £89.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £421.00k £447.00k £503.00k £1.08m £930.00k
Expenditure - Investment management £83.00k £118.00k £118.00k £113.96k £194.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0