POOR MAN'S PIECE

Charity number: 233750
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 02/01/2016 02/01/2017 02/01/2018 02/01/2019 02/01/2020
Total gross income £20 £20 £20 £20 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A