Trustees JOHN HAMMOND CHARITY

Charity number: 234031
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Roger Taylor Trustee 13 October 2021
None on record
SARAH EVA Trustee 15 October 2019
None on record
Victoria Kitchenor Trustee 18 October 2017
None on record
JOHN SOUSTER Trustee 13 October 2013
None on record
PAM WATERS Trustee 26 February 2013
PIRTON JOYCARE
Received: On time
PIRTON VILLAGE HALL
Received: 2 days late
EDITH WILSHERE Trustee
None on record
HAZEL DAVIES Trustee
None on record
RODNEY MARSHALL Trustee
None on record