BIRMINGHAM DIOCESAN TRUST

Charity number: 234216
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £22.01m £22.65m £22.52m £22.17m £19.49m
Total expenditure £25.19m £25.55m £26.58m £26.13m £23.85m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £765.00k £962.00k £682.00k £804.52k £651.83k
Income - Donations and legacies £14.69m £14.21m £15.32m £14.15m £11.29m
Income - Other trading activities £2.05m £1.99m £2.00m £1.88m £941.00k
Income - Charitable activities £1.68m £1.62m £1.62m £1.96m £1.64m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £58.00k £63.00k £0
Income - Investment £3.19m £3.41m £3.27m £3.19m £2.66m
Income - Other £412.00k £1.42m £371.00k £1.05m £2.95m
Income - Legacies £426.00k £1.55m £3.12m £1.40m £715.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £24.25m £24.54m £25.77m £25.39m £23.25m
Expenditure - Raising funds £938.00k £1.01m £801.00k £733.00k £604.00k
Expenditure - Governance £259.00k £285.00k £2.36m £593.00k £419.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.49m £1.21m £808.00k £807.00k £929.00k
Expenditure - Investment management £502.00k £570.00k £445.00k £441.00k £455.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0