BEDFORDSHIRE CHARITABLE TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 234329
Charity reporting is up to date (58 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 March 2021 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 30 March 2021 58 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 29 April 2020 89 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 29 April 2020 89 days late Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 30 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 30 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 21 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 21 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2016 03 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 03 February 2017 On time Download