Accounts and annual returns CWMBRAN ARTS TRUST

Charity number: 234512
Charity reporting is overdue by 132 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 132 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 132 days
Annual return 05 April 2022 15 June 2023 130 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 15 June 2023 495 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 27 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 27 January 2021 357 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required