Financial history CWMBRAN ARTS TRUST

Charity number: 234512
Charity reporting is overdue by 134 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £75 £70 £63 £2 £6
Total expenditure £0 £3.94k £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A