Financial history ST COLUMBA'S PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH OF ENGLAND NORTH SHIELDS (TRUST PROPERTY HELD IN CONNECTION WITH)

Charity number: 235022
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £107 £112 £119 £125 £101
Total expenditure £106 £111 £116 £123 £113
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A