PARISH HALL CHARITY

Charity number: 235455
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £23.52k £19.55k £20.98k £20.44k £27.72k
Total expenditure £22.20k £20.54k £13.89k £25.82k £25.11k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.50k £200 N/A N/A £10.00k