DESBOROUGH TOWN WELFARE COMMITTEE

Charity number: 235505
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £5.61k £5.65k £663 £6.46k £5.69k