Financial history TRUST PROPERTY ICW ST JOHN'S CONGREGATIONAL CHURCH

Charity number: 235521
Charity reporting is overdue by 107 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £39.64k £40.84k £50.52k £60.40k £61.06k
Total expenditure £43.18k £52.56k £49.42k £58.03k £51.32k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A