SALHOUSE UNITED CHARITIES

Charity number: 235690
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.46k £41.77k £1.80k £1.80k £2.81k
Total expenditure £693 £776 £2.81k £3.59k £2.07k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A