THE HAPPY WANDERERS AMBULANCE ORGANISATION

Charity number: 235857
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 29 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 17 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 18 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 16 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 30 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required