FRIENDS OF ESSEX CHURCHES TRUST

Charity number: 236033
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Francis James Archibald Bettley FSA Trustee 07 September 2020 None on record
CATHERINE LEEDER Trustee 16 May 2018 None on record
Gail Jane Jones Trustee 07 September 2020 None on record
JEREMY WILLIAM BEALE Trustee 13 May 2015 None on record
JOHN EDWARD JUXON PICKTHORN Trustee 13 May 2015
THE FRIENDS OF AUDLEY END Received: On time
MR MARTIN STUCHFIELD Chair 13 May 2015
FRANCIS COALES CHARITABLE FOUNDATION Received: On time
THE ESSEX SOCIETY FOR ARCHAEOLOGY AND HISTORY Received: On time
MONUMENTAL BRASS SOCIETY Received: On time
STOW MARIES GREAT WAR AERODROME LTD Received: On time
Rachel Grainger Trustee 01 May 2016 None on record
Joanna Pimblett Trustee 07 September 2020 None on record
CANON H MARSH Trustee 15 May 2014
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF GREAT BADDOW, ST MARY THE VIRGIN Received: On time