EATON FUND FOR ARTISTS, NURSES AND GENTLEWOMEN

Charity number: 236060
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £300.31k £304.57k £305.27k £312.90k £328.71k
Total expenditure £344.36k £361.98k £364.92k £359.47k £433.90k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A