CHARITY OF MARY ANN LE FEAVER

Charity number: 236408
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 11 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 25 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 05 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 12 December 2016 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required