Financial history SOUTH LONDON LIBERAL SYNAGOGUE

Charity number: 236711
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £128.88k £93.24k £117.67k £104.68k £229.67k
Total expenditure £105.10k £138.51k £132.08k £108.93k £117.59k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A