Accounts and annual returns THE MAJENDIE CHARITY FOR THE POOR OF SPEEN

Charity number: 236774
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2022 26 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 21 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 16 September 2021 223 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 16 September 2021 589 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 16 September 2021 954 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required