Financial history THE MAJENDIE CHARITY FOR THE POOR OF SPEEN

Charity number: 236774
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £5.26k £5.37k £5.48k £5.59k £5.70k
Total expenditure £0 £290 £340 £395 £40.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A