THE KENDAL UNITARIAN CHAPEL TRUST

Charity number: 236829
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £89.09k £124.51k £111.36k £103.13k £93.85k
Total expenditure £103.14k £161.16k £119.07k £73.25k £129.16k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £1.60k