Financial history JOHN LAING CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 236852
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £2.51m £2.60m £2.74m £1.87m £2.30m
Total expenditure £2.38m £3.45m £2.85m £3.95m £2.19m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £25.00k £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.51m £2.60m £2.71m £1.84m £2.30m
Income - Other £0 £0 £4.00k £25.00k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.38m £3.45m £2.70m £3.82m £2.04m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £147.00k £133.00k £147.00k
Expenditure - Governance £10.80k £17.38k £35.59k £31.00k £46.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.22m £2.40m £1.52m £2.55m £948.00k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £147.00k £133.00k £147.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0