Financial history CANONESSES REGULAR OF SAINT AUGUSTINE OF THE PRIORY OF OUR LADY OF GOOD COUNSEL

Charity number: 236981
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £172.39k £180.99k £210.12k £164.36k £196.44k
Total expenditure £194.89k £199.99k £178.35k £198.49k £159.38k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A