Trustees WEC INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 237005
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CAROLYN MARY DAVEY Chair 31 October 2017
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PAUL, LEAMINGTON PRIORS
Received: On time
ANDREW LEONARD BERRY Trustee 14 July 2021
CITY CHURCH WOLVERHAMPTON
Recently registered
HENRIETTA LOUISE COZENS Trustee 14 July 2021
None on record
Andrew Paul Cousins Trustee 16 July 2020
None on record
STEPHEN LINDSAY BANNER Trustee 31 January 2018
None on record
VIVIAN JOHN WHITTON Trustee 08 June 2010
None on record
NEIL WARDROPE Trustee 08 June 2010
None on record