Accounts and annual returns CHARITY OF SYDNEY POOLE LOWDELL

Charity number: 237148
Charity reporting is overdue by 169 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 169 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 169 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 20 July 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 05 January 2022 66 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 24 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 11 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required