THE HALE COTTAGE TRUST

Charity number: 237465
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 26 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 27 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 16 December 2019 139 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 09 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 08 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required