CHARITIES OF HENRY SMITH AND OTHERS

Charity number: 237888
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Linked charities
Governing document
WILL PROVED AT PPR 24 OCTOBER 1863 AND SCHEMES OF 16 MAY 1899 AND 29 AUGUST 1933 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 13 NOVEMBER 2007
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE POOR OF THE PARISH, POOR WIDOWS OF THE PARISH SHALL TAKE A LARGER SHARE THAN OTHERS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF FRENSHAM.
Registration history
  • 07 March 1968 : Standard registration