THE ROYAL ARTILLERY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 238197
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £429.41k £277.74k £291.29k £346.34k £320.47k
Total expenditure £344.24k £305.63k £271.80k £364.06k £341.58k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A