SISTERS OF THE HOLY CROSS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 238426
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £31.48m £4.78m £5.45m £6.42m £5.91m
Total expenditure £4.18m £4.82m £5.45m £6.84m £5.60m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £447.80k £280.66k £374.21k £479.94k £397.14k
Income - Other trading activities £3.56m £3.75m £3.95m £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £4.16m £3.75m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £299.85k £754.80k £1.12m £1.19m £1.18m
Income - Other £27.17m £0 £2.88k £590.54k £575.97k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.17m £4.75m £5.37m £6.75m £5.53m
Expenditure - Raising funds £14.33k £66.48k £80.42k £83.61k £65.64k
Expenditure - Governance £44.42k £227.98k £311.90k £1.02m £39.79k
Expenditure - Grants institution £122.04k £532.33k £865.29k £1.11m £977.43k
Expenditure - Investment management £14.33k £66.48k £80.42k £83.61k £65.64k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0