FIRST CHURCH OF CHRIST, SCIENTIST, CROYDON, SURREY

Charity number: 238906
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 02 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 02 July 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2019 21 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 21 May 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2018 05 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 05 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2017 27 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

27 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2016 24 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

24 May 2017 On time Download