SOUTHGATE PROGRESSIVE SYNAGOGUE

Charity number: 239096
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £372.44k £339.16k £336.16k £337.60k £309.70k
Total expenditure £312.33k £314.36k £351.78k £331.36k £312.76k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A