AUGUSTA ANNE DAWKINS AND JULIANA HARRIOT DAWKINS

Charity number: 239586
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 18/02/2017 18/02/2018 18/02/2019 18/02/2020 18/02/2021
Total gross income £160 £202 £199 £205 £857
Total expenditure £0 £60 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A