Financial history FIRST CHURCH OF CHRIST SCIENTIST SUTTON COLDFIELD AND READING ROOM

Charity number: 239667
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £20.07k £11.80k £12.92k £9.81k £11.82k
Total expenditure £18.67k £21.39k £21.28k £18.29k £14.62k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A