Accounts and annual returns CHARITY OF THE REVEREND GEORGE FREDERICK FESSEY FOR COAL

Charity number: 239779
Charity reporting is overdue by 258 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 258 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 258 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 29 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 March 2021 142 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required