THE GUILD OF ALL SOULS

Charity number: 240234
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £46.38k £55.03k £48.93k £39.77k £44.24k
Total expenditure £56.86k £53.26k £84.85k £50.71k £45.42k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A