Financial history BISHOP SETH WARD ALMSHOUSE TRUST

Charity number: 240885
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £141.76k £93.74k £72.74k £80.51k £79.11k
Total expenditure £31.60k £62.88k £35.82k £25.74k £30.42k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A